Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Seema Verma, Alex M. Azar, II and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00859
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. Seema Verma served on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Thomas, Sam)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. United States of America served on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Thomas, Sam)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. Alex M. Azar, II served on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Thomas, Sam)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Blunden on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Blunden, Rebecca)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Tominello on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Tominello, Andrew)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, and Seema Verma. (VM)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company as to Alex M. Azar, II. (Thomas, Sam)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company as to Seema Verma. (Thomas, Sam)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint, by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company: Exhibit 51 - E.Gray - 2017.12.27 - May to CMS w attachments. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52 - E.Gray - 2017.8.11 - CMS to FB, #2 Exhibit 53 - E.Gray - 2017.9.27 - CMS to FB, #3 Exhibit 54 - E.Gray - 2017.11.22 - CMS to FB - Notice of Intent to Refer to Treas, #4 Exhibit 55 - E.Gray - 2018.6.25 - Treas to FB, #5 Exhibit 56 - T.Martindale - Crash Report, #6 Exhibit 57 - T.Martindale - Certified Policy, #7 Exhibit 58 - T.Martindale - Payment register w ltr to insured and check copies, #8 Exhibit 59 - T.Martindale - 2016.5.26 - CMS to FB - Ongoing resp for meds, #9 Exhibit 60 - T.Martindale - 2016.6.6 - FB to CMS - Coverage Exhausted (by fax), #10 Exhibit 61 - T.Martindale - 2017.10.16 - CMS to FB - Demand, #11 Exhibit 62 - T.Martindale - 2017.12.1 - CMS to FB - Demand, #12 Exhibit 63 - T.Martindale - 2018.1.24 - CMS to FB - Notice to Refer to Treas, #13 Exhibit 64 - T.Martindale - 2018.4.9 - Treas to FB, #14 Exhibit 65 - T.Martindale - 2018.4.20 - FB to Treas, #15 Exhibit 66 - D.Swain - Crash Report, #16 Exhibit 67 - D.Swain - Certified Policy, #17 Exhibit 68 - D.Swain - 2018.6.14 - CMS to FB, #18 Exhibit 69 - D.Swain - 2018.6.21 - FB to CMS, #19 Exhibit 70 - D.Swain - 2018.6.18 - Rogers to CMS, #20 Exhibit 71 - D.Swain - 2018.8.29 - FB to CMS, #21 Exhibit 72 - D.Swain - 2018.10.9 - CMS int to refer to Treas, #22 Exhibit 73 - D.Swain - 2018.10.16 - FB Resp to CMS Notice of Intent to Refer, #23 Exhibit 73A, #24 Exhibit 74 - T.Harlan - Accident Report, #25 Exhibit 75 - T.Harlan - 2017.7.14 - CMS to FB - Conditional Pmt Notice, #26 Exhibit 76 - T.Harlan - 2017.8.31 - CMS to FB - Initial Demand, #27 Exhibit 77 - T.Harlan - 2017.10.20 - CMS to FB - Second Conditional Pmt Notice, #28 Exhibit 78 - T.Harlan - 2017.10.24 - CMS to FB - Intent to Refer to Treas, #29 Exhibit 79 - T.Harlan - 2017.10.29 - Treas to FB - Treas Demand, #30 Exhibit 80 - M.Williams - Certified Policy, #31 Exhibit 81 - M.Williams - 2017.7.14 - CMS to FB - Cond Pmt Notice, #32 Exhibit 82 - M.Williams - 2018.10.24 - CMS to FB - Int to Refer to Treas, #33 Exhibit 83 - M.Williams - 2018.10.29 - Dept of Treas to FB - Demand)(VM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint, by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company: Exhibit 21 - J.Roland - 2018.2.21 - FB to Treasury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22 - J.Roland - 2018.6.14 - Treasury to FB - Debt Valid, #2 Exhibit 23 - M.Broome - Accident Report, #3 Exhibit 24 - M.Broome - Certified Policy, #4 Exhibit 25 - M.Broome - 2017.12.20 - CMS to FB Conditional Pmt Notice, #5 Exhibit 26 - M.Broome - 2018.2.5 - CMS to FB Demand, #6 Exhibit 27 - M.Broome - 2018.6.11 - CMS to FB Demand, #7 Criminal Cover Sheet 28 - M.Broome - 2018.6.16 - FB to CMS, #8 Exhibit 28A, #9 Exhibit 29 - A.Barnes - Certified Policy, #10 Exhibit 30 - A.Barnes - 2017.8.1 - CMS to FB - Conditional Pmt Notice, #11 Exhibit 31 - A.Barnes - 2017.8.18 - FB Resp to CMS, #12 Exhibit 32 - A.Barnes - 2017.10.17 - FB to CMS, #13 Exhibit 33 - A.Barnes - 2017.11.20 - FB to CMS, #14 Exhibit 34 - A.Barnes - 2018.9.10 - Conserve to FB, #15 Exhibit 35 - D.Lovett - Crash Report, #16 Exhibit 36 - D.Lovett - Certified Policy, #17 Exhibit 37 - D.Lovett - 2018.4.23 - CMS Demand, #18 Exhibit 37A, #19 Exhibit 37B, #20 Exhibit 37C, #21 Exhibit 38 - E.Huff - Certified Policy, #22 Exhibit 39 - E.Huff - Kings Daughters Pmt, #23 Exhibit 40 - E.Huff - 2017.7.25 - CMS to FB Conditional Pmt Notice, #24 Exhibit 41 - E.Huff - 2017.8.15 - FB to CMS, #25 Exhibit 42 - E.Huff - 2018.9.10 - Conserve to FB, #26 Exhibit 43 - E.Huff - 2018.9.18 - FB to Conserve, #27 Exhibit 44 - J.Hicks - Jenkins Certified Policy, #28 Exhibit 45 - A.Jenkins - 2017.8.31 - CMS to FB, #29 Exhibit 46 - J.Hicks - 2017.1.12 - CMS to FB - Conditional Pmt Notice, #30 Exhibit 47 - A.Jenkins - 2007.11.7 - FB to CMS, #31 Exhibit 48 - A.Jenkins - 2018.3.12 - Dept of Treas and FB Pmt, #32 Exhibit 49 - A.Jenkins - 2018.9.17 - Conserve, #33 Exhibit 50 - E.Gray - Certified Policy)(VM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint, by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company : Exhibit 1 - C.Murray - Certified Policy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - C.Murray - 2017.7.17 Conditional Payment Notice, #2 Exhibit 3 - C.Murray - 2016.4.19 CMS to FB - Matter Resolved, #3 Exhibit 4 - C.Murray - 2017.8.2 FB to CMS, #4 Exhibit 5 - C.Murray - 2018.1.15 - Treas to FB, #5 Exhibit 6 - B.Hutson - Certified Policy, #6 Exhibit 7 - B.Hutson - 17.8.29 - CMS' Conditional Notice, #7 Exhibit 8 - B.Hutson - 17.10.16 - CMS Demand, #8 Exhibit 9 - B.Hutson - 18.2.20 - Dept of Treas - Demand, #9 Exhibit 10 - V.Washington - Certified Policy, #10 Exhibit 11 - V.Washington - 2016.2.2 - Medpay to UMMC, #11 Exhibit 12 - V.Washington - 2017.12.20 - CMS to FB - Intent to Refer to Treas, #12 Exhibit 13 - V.Washington - 2018.2.26 - Treasury to FB ($6895.33 demand), #13 Exhibit 13A, #14 Exhibit 14 - K.Broome - 2017.8.10 - CMS to FB - Conditional Payment Notice, #15 Exhibit 15 - K.Broome - 2018.2.2 - Treas to FB Demand, #16 Exhibit 16 - J.Roland - Certified Policy, #17 Exhibit 17 - J.Roland - 2017.8.25 - CMS Conditional Pmt Notice, #18 Exhibit 18 - J.Roland - 2017.10.12 - CMS Demand, #19 Exhibit 19 - J.Roland - 2017.12.6 - CMS Demand, #20 Exhibit 20 - J.Roalnd - 2018.2.13 - Treas to FB Demand)(VM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company for Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Thomas, Sam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, United States of America, Seema Verma, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (VM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against United States of America, Alex M. Azar, II, and Seema Verma (Filing fee $400 receipt number 34643052974), filed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Sam S. Thomas
Represented By: James R. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew F. Tominello
Represented By: Rebecca Blunden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?