The Mississippi Bar v. Plunkett
Plaintiff: The Mississippi Bar
Respondent: Sharon G. Plunkett
Interested Party: Katherine Alexander, Sandra E Campbell and Arthur Johnston
Case Number: 3:2019ad00001
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER filed in the U. S. Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit on 3/8/2019 and received in this Court on 5/1/2019 to remove Sharon Gould Plunkett's name from the roll of attorneys admitted to practice in same Court. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KHA)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of DISBARMENT as to Sharon G. Plunkett. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 04/04/2019. (KHA)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, "Return To Sender, Sharon Plunkett PLLC, Box Closed, Unable To Forward" as to #2 Order to Show Cause. (KHA)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Sharon G. Plunkett. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 03/04/2019. (KHA)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER OF DISBARMENT as to Sharon G. Plunkett by the Supreme Court of Mississippi, dated February 28th, 2019, Cause No. 2018-BD-001382-SCT and filed by same. (Attachments: #(1) Cover Letter and Envelope. (KHA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Mississippi Bar v. Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Katherine Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sandra E Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Arthur Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sharon G. Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Mississippi Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?