Webster v. Jackson HMA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Betty Webster
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Jackson HMA LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00021
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 : Incorrect linkage made. REBUTTAL should be linked to #7 MOTION to Remand or in Alternative to Stay. All related filings to motions (using the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings.(LAT)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Rebuttal re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, re #7 MOTION to Remand or in Alternative to Stay filed by Betty Webster, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Chambers, Rayford) Modified on 3/6/2019 (LAT).
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand or in Alternative to Stay filed by Jackson HMA LLC (Kruger, Stephen)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 2/12/2019. (SR)
February 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (LAT)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Remand or in Alternative to Stay filed by Betty Webster (Chambers, Rayford)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand or in Alternative to Stay by Betty Webster (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chambers, Rayford)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony R. Gaylor on behalf of Betty Webster (Gaylor, Tony)
February 8, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # [Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. There is no document attached. Court staff will refile docket entry to reflect an attached document. (LAT)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis G. Baine, III on behalf of Jackson HMA LLC (Baine, Louis)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
February 1, 2019 Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET due to a conflict with counsel for plaintiff's schedule for 3/19/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Counsel will follow the instructions given in the Initial Rule 16(a) Order. (SR)
February 1, 2019 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) Modified on 2/8/2019 (LAT).
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Jackson HMA LLC (Kruger, Stephen)
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Jackson HMA LLC.(Kruger, Stephen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jackson HMA LLC from Hinds County Circuit Court, Mississippi, case number 18-475. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3890760) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Jackson HMA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Webster
Represented By: Rayford G. Chambers
Represented By: Tony R. Gaylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson HMA LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Kruger
Represented By: Louis G. Baine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?