Wood et al v. Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Kay Madison, Samuel Peoples and Patsy Wood
Defendant: Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC and Defendants A through Z
Case Number: 3:2019cv00032
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Linda R Anderson
1 Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Response in Opposition to Motion, #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sandra Kay Madison, Samuel Peoples, Patsy Wood (Ferrell, Wayne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Kidd, Dean)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order, #2 Exhibit B - Second Motion for Additional Time to Serve Defendants)(Kidd, Dean)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 2/14/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sandra Kay Madison, Samuel Peoples, Patsy Wood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service)(Ferrell, Wayne)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sandra Kay Madison, Samuel Peoples, Patsy Wood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service)(Ferrell, Wayne)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Volumes 1-10 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Volume 2, #2 Attachment Volume 3, #3 Attachment Volume 4, #4 Attachment Volume 5, #5 Attachment Volume 6, #6 Attachment Volume 7, #7 Attachment Volume 8, #8 Attachment Volume 9, #9 Attachment Volume 10)(Kidd, Dean)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC from Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 251-13-807-CIV. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-3893267) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - March 2, 2017 Order, #3 Exhibit C - September 13, 2018 Opinion, #4 Exhibit D - December 13, 2018 Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Kay Madison
Represented By: Wayne E. Ferrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Peoples
Represented By: Wayne E. Ferrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Wood
Represented By: Wayne E. Ferrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Bradley W. Smith
Represented By: Dean Sterling Kidd
Represented By: Jean Cooper Bertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants A through Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?