Burrell v. Brazier et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Burrell
Defendant: Nurse Chrislind Charezenk, Nurse Practitioner Unknown King, CC, Nurse Ruby Luckett, Dr. Gloria Perry, Warden J. Shivers and Dr. W. Brazier
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00099
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, the Clerk of Court shall mail to pro se Plaintiff Tyrone Burrell a copy of the signature page of the Attachment [Dkt. 5, p. 1]. Plaintiff is directed to place his signature on the document and return it to the Court on or before April 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/2/2019. [Copy of Order and page 1 of Dkt. 5 mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order.; *RESTRICTED* granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/1/19. [Copy mailed to plaintiff and Premier Supply Link](LDR)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tyrone Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Tyrone Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint by Tyrone Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2,, Acknowledgement filed by Tyrone Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 3/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/7/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tyrone Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(VM)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W. Brazier, Chrislind Charezenk, Unknown King, Ruby Luckett, Gloria Perry, J. Shivers, filed by Tyrone Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope #4 Notice of Assignment) (VM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrell v. Brazier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Chrislind Charezenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Practitioner Unknown King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Ruby Luckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gloria Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden J. Shivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. W. Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?