Cameron v. Durham School Services et al

Plaintiff: Erica N. Cameron
Defendant: Leroy Chaney, School Services, Durham School Services and Torrance Virgil
Case Number: 3:2019cv00123
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Durham School Services, School Services.(Cannady, Ashley)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Leroy Chaney, Torrance Virgil (Cannady, Ashley)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Leroy Chaney, Torrance Virgil (Cannady, Ashley)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by Erica N. Cameron.(Mumford, Jarrod)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Leroy Chaney answer due 3/14/2019; Durham School Services answer due 3/14/2019; School Services answer due 3/14/2019; Torrance Virgil answer due 3/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/11/19 (RBM)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Leroy Chaney, Durham School Services, School Services, Torrance Virgil (Cannady, Ashley)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Leroy Chaney answer due 3/7/2019; Durham School Services answer due 3/7/2019; Torrance Virgil answer due 3/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/27/19 (RBM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Leroy Chaney, Durham School Services, School Services, Torrance Virgil (Cannady, Ashley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Leroy Chaney, Durham School Services, Torrance Virgil from Circuit Court of Madison County, MS, case number CI 2018-248-JC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3918578) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron v. Durham School Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica N. Cameron
Represented By: Jarrod D. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Chaney
Represented By: Ashley Eley Cannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Services
Represented By: Ashley Eley Cannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durham School Services
Represented By: Ashley Eley Cannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrance Virgil
Represented By: Ashley Eley Cannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?