McRae Law Firm, PLLC v. Gilmer et al

Plaintiff: McRae Law Firm, PLLC
Defendant: Gilmer Law Firm, A Professional Association, Matthew Wade Gilmer, Barry Wade Gilmer and Gilmer Law Firm, PLLC (Business ID 1041903)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00124
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Matthew Wade Gilmer (Abdeen, Eddie)
April 15, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Matthew Wade Gilmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C)(Abdeen, Eddie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Michael Ellingburg, Jr on behalf of Barry Wade Gilmer, Gilmer Law Firm, A Professional Association (Ellingburg, C.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by McRae Law Firm, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit 1-Email from Barry Gilmer (Matthew declines to attend depo) (2.14.19))(McRae, Charles)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #10 MOTION to Remand and for Attorney Fees. Response due on 4/15/2019. If respondent wishes to confess the motion to remand he may do so before the deadline. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 3/29/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Memorandum Brief by Matthew Wade Gilmer, Gilmer Law Firm, PLLC (Business ID 1041903) (Abdeen, Eddie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees by Matthew Wade Gilmer, Gilmer Law Firm, PLLC (Business ID 1041903) (Abdeen, Eddie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eddie J. Abdeen on behalf of Matthew Wade Gilmer, Gilmer Law Firm, PLLC (Business ID 1041903) (Abdeen, Eddie)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. Counsel for plaintiff shall promptly notify the Magistrate Judge of the entry of any order denying the Motion to Remand and shall submit a proposed order lifting the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/19/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 : This document requests two motion reliefs. Every motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (KNS)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand and for Just Costs and Expenses filed by McRae Law Firm, PLLC (Biegel, Michele)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by McRae Law Firm, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint filed 7.21.16, #2 Exhibit 2 - 1st Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1st Order of Remand, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Appeal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Dismissing Appeal, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2nd Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2nd Order of Remand, #8 Exhibit 8 - RICO Complaint filed 5.24.17, #9 Exhibit 9 - 3rd Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Order and Opinion - Bramlette Remand, #11 Exhibit 11 - 3rd Order of Remand, #12 Exhibit 12 - Order and Opinon - Bramlette Fees, #13 Exhibit 13 - Transcript - 2.5& 6.19 Trial, #14 Exhibit 14 - Amended Complaint filed 2.7.19, #15 Exhibit 15 - Email from Barry - Matthew declines to attend deposition 2.14.19, #16 Exhibit 16 - Notice of Removal filed by Matthew 2.15.19)(Biegel, Michele). Added MOTION for Just Costs and Expenses and Attorney Fees on 3/19/2019 (KNS).
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Consent Of Removal by Gilmer Law Firm, PLLC (Business ID 1041903) re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Gilmer, Matthew)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Consent Of Removal By All Remaining Defendants by Barry Wade Gilmer, Gilmer Law Firm, A Professional Association re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Order Of Hon. David Bramlette, #2 Exhibit A- Remaining Defendants' Petition Seeking Judge Bramlette's Approval To Consent To Removal)(Gilmer, Barry)
March 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for April 2, 2019 is hereby cancelled. (Lewis, Nijah)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. McRae on behalf of McRae Law Firm, PLLC (McRae, Charles)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses by Barry Wade Gilmer, Gilmer Law Firm, A Professional Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails Of McRae And Biegel Attempting To Tape Record Bobby Gibson, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit Of Seth C. Little)(Gilmer, Barry)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 State Court Record by Defendant Matthew Wade Gilmer Volumes 2 of 2 (split due to size) (Gilmer, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendant Matthew Wade Gilmer Volumes 1 of 2 (split due to size) (Gilmer, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses in response to McRae's Complaint, Doc.1-1 by Matthew Wade Gilmer, Gilmer Law Firm, PLLC (Business ID 1041903). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- First Filed Federal Complaints, #2 Exhibit B- Emails Of Biegel and McRae attempting to record Bobby Gibson, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit Of Seth C. Little)(Gilmer, Matthew)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Wade Gilmer from Chancery Court of the First Judicial District of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CH1:16-cv-01064. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643053730) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Motion for Sequestration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRae Law Firm, PLLC v. Gilmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McRae Law Firm, PLLC
Represented By: Michele Dawn Biegel
Represented By: Charles R. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilmer Law Firm, A Professional Association
Represented By: Barry W. Gilmer
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Wade Gilmer
Represented By: Matthew Wade Gilmer
Represented By: Eddie J. Abdeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Wade Gilmer
Represented By: Barry W. Gilmer
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilmer Law Firm, PLLC (Business ID 1041903)
Represented By: Matthew Wade Gilmer
Represented By: Eddie J. Abdeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?