Brown Bottling Group, Inc. v. Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Brown Bottling Group, Inc.
Defendant: AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc., Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C., Long Wholesale, Inc., The Corr-Williams Company, MS Wholesales 1 Inc., The H.T. Hackney Co. and W.L. Petrey Wholesale Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00142
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION for Discovery filed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc. (Sykes, Phillip)
April 16, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Discovery by Brown Bottling Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Document Requests, #2 Exhibit 1 to Document Requests Brown Bottling Territory, #3 Exhibit 2 to Document Requests PepsiCo and KDP Brands, #4 Exhibit B - Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 1 to Interrogatories Brown Bottling Territory, #6 Exhibit 2 to Interrogatories PepsiCo and KDP Brands, #7 Exhibit C - Request for Entry and Inspection, #8 Exhibit 1 to Request for Entry and Inspection PepsiCo and KDP Brands)(Sykes, Phillip)
April 15, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc.. W.L. Petrey Wholesale Co., Inc. served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Sykes, Phillip)
April 15, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc.. MS Wholesales 1 Inc. served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Sykes, Phillip)
April 15, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc.. The H.T. Hackney Co. served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Sykes, Phillip)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc.. The Corr-Williams Company served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Sykes, Phillip)
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to MS Wholesales 1 Inc., The Corr-Williams Company, The H.T. Hackney Co., and W.L. Petrey Wholesale Co., Inc.. (ND)
April 12, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EBA with PepsiCo, #2 Exhibit 2 - EBA with Dr. Pepper, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sculley 7-14-1980 letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - C&D letter to Imperial Trading, #5 Exhibit 5 - C&D letter to Long Wholesale, #6 Exhibit 6 - C&D letter to AAA Cash and Carry Wholesale, #7 Exhibit 7 - C&D letter to Corr-Williams, #8 Exhibit 8 - C&D letter to H.T. Hackney Co., #9 Exhibit 9 - C&D letter to Miss. Wholesale, #10 Exhibit 10 - C&D letter to W.L. Petrey Wholesale Co., Inc., #11 Exhibit 11 - PepsiCo C&D letter to Imperial, #12 Exhibit 12 - PepsiCo C&D letter to Long, #13 Exhibit 13 - PepsiCo C&D letter to AAA Cash & Carry)(Sykes, Phillip)
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C., Long Wholesale, Inc. (Seanor, Christina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C., Long Wholesale, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Wyoming Beverage-granting MTD in part)(Seanor, Christina)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc. (Graham, Mona)
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc. (Graham, Mona)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R. Blackwood on behalf of Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C., Long Wholesale, Inc. (Blackwood, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C. and Long Wholesale, Inc.'s answers are due 4/8/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/19/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C., Long Wholesale, Inc. (Seanor, Christina)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Seanor on behalf of Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C., Long Wholesale, Inc. (Seanor, Christina)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc. AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc. Consequently, AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc.'s answer is due 3/29/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/14/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Lindsey Hammons on behalf of AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc. (Hammons, Sarah)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mona Patel Graham on behalf of AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc. (Graham, Mona)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc. (Graham, Mona)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc. (Graham, Mona)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Webster C. Cash III. Webster C. Cash, III is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Brown Bottling Group, Inc. in association with local counsel upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/5/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hugh Quan Gottschalk. Hugh Quan Gottschalk is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Brown Bottling Group, Inc. in association with local counsel upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/5/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Fowler Gregory on behalf of Brown Bottling Group, Inc. (Gregory, Haley)
March 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fees paid by Hugh Quan Gottschalk and Webster C. Cash III in the amount of $ 200 ($100 each), receipt number 34643053936. (ND)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Webster C. Cash III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brown Bottling Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sykes, Phillip)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Hugh Quan Gottschalk to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brown Bottling Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sykes, Phillip)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc.. Long Wholesale, Inc. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Sykes, Phillip)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc.. AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Sykes, Phillip)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc.. Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Sykes, Phillip)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brown Bottling Group, Inc. (Sykes, Phillip)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc., Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C. and Long Wholesale, Inc.. (ND)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc., Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C. and Long Wholesale, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt number 0538-3924374) filed by Brown Bottling Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Brown EBA with PepsiCo, #2 Exhibit 2 - Brown EBA with Dr. Pepper, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sculley Letter to all Bottlers, #4 Exhibit 4 - C&D Letter to Imperial Trading, #5 Exhibit 5 - C&D Letter to Long Wholesale, #6 Exhibit 6 - C&D Letter to AAA, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown Bottling Group, Inc. v. Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Cash & Carry Wholesale, Inc.
Represented By: Mona Patel Graham
Represented By: Sarah Lindsey Hammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Trading Co., L.L.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Blackwood
Represented By: Christina M. Seanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Wholesale, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Blackwood
Represented By: Christina M. Seanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Corr-Williams Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS Wholesales 1 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The H.T. Hackney Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Petrey Wholesale Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown Bottling Group, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip S. Sykes
Represented By: Webster C. Cash - PHV, III
Represented By: Hugh Quan Gottschalk - PHV
Represented By: Haley Fowler Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?