Forbes v. Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Deloris Forbes
Defendant: Woodlands Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC and Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00164
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 Corrected ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc..(Hodges, Melissa)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc..(Hodges, Melissa)
April 23, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : Incorrect document attached. Attorney is directed to refile and attach the correct pdf document. (KNS)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc..(Hodges, Melissa) Modified on 4/23/2019 (KNS).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc., Woodlands Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC. Defendants shall have up to and including April 22, 2019 to file their response. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 4/16/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc., Woodlands Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC (Hodges, Melissa)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deloris Forbes. Woodlands Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Watson, Louis)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deloris Forbes. Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc. served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Watson, Louis)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc., Woodlands Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC. (KNS)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc., Woodlands Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3931718), filed by Deloris Forbes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forbes v. Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Forbes
Represented By: Robert Nicholas Norris
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodlands Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexion Health at Clinton, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?