Clark v. Tonins et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Clark
Defendant: John Does 1-5, Randy Manning, Avery Tonins, American Mutual Insurance Company and Christian D. McCormack
Case Number: 3:2019cv00247
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Randy Manning.(Kelly, Bradley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Remand , #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by American Mutual Insurance Company (Sharp, Myles)
May 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as a Memorandum in Support linked to the Response and original Motion. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event. (VM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand as Plaintiff filed, filed by American Mutual Insurance Company (Sharp, Myles) Modified on 5/15/2019 (VM).
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff filed by American Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Insurance Policy)(Sharp, Myles)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #3 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/7/2019. (JEJ)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Remand filed by Jeff Clark (Jones, Baskin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by Jeff Clark (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Police Report, #2 Exhibit Redacted Medical)(Jones, Baskin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Mutual Insurance Company.(Sharp, Myles)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Mutual Insurance Company from County Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 19-985. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3962733) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Tonins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Manning
Represented By: Bradley Smith Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Tonins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Myles Ethan Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian D. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Clark
Represented By: Baskin L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?