Abram v. Allstate Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Alice H. Abram
Defendant: John Doe Individuals 1-10, Allstate Insurance Company, John Doe Corporations 1 - 10 and Hanna K. Berry
Case Number: 3:2019cv00319
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand Corrected filed by Alice H. Abram (Love, Rodney)
June 26, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Remand Corrected. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before July 1, 2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on June 26, 2019. (DI)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Alice H. Abram (Love, Rodney)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #16 MOTION to Remand Corrected filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 Response in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand Corrected by Alice H. Abram (Love, Rodney) filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Insurance Policy)(Bragg, Grafton)
June 13, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant's reply shall be filed on or before June 19, 2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on June 13, 2019. (DI)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss by Allstate Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER cancelling telephonic case management conference set for June 20, 2019. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/11/2019. (JEJ)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #16 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/11/2019. (JEJ)
June 5, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to [11, 12, 13]: Attorney advises that there are errors in these entries, and it should be disregarded. They have been correctly refiled as [14, 15, 16]. (VM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand Corrected by Alice H. Abram (Love, Rodney)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss Corrected filed by Alice H. Abram (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Love, Rodney)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss Corrected filed by Alice H. Abram (Love, Rodney)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alice H. Abram (Love, Rodney) Modified on 6/6/2019 (VM).
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alice H. Abram (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Love, Rodney) Modified on 6/6/2019 (VM).
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. MOTION to Remand by Alice H. Abram (Love, Rodney) Modified on 6/6/2019 (VM).
May 30, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before June 5, 2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on May 30, 2019. (DI)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Allstate Insurance Company #6 Motion to Sever or Dismiss by Alice H. Abram (Love, Rodney) Modified on 5/31/2019 (VM).
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Hanna K. Berry.(Waits, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Waits on behalf of Hanna K. Berry (Waits, John)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss by Allstate Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 State Court Record by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company Volumes 1 (Bragg, Grafton)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company.(Bragg, Grafton)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from In the Circuit Court of Simpson County, Mississippi, case number 19-96. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3983115) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Executed Summons Return, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Irenea Fitzgerald, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) Modified on 5/6/2019 (VM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abram v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Individuals 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Grafton E. Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna K. Berry
Represented By: John A. Waits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice H. Abram
Represented By: Rodney M. Love-State Gov
Represented By: Rodney M. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?