Smith v. East Mississippi Electric Power Association
Plaintiff: William Paul Smith
Defendant: East Mississippi Electric Power Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv00335
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by East Mississippi Electric Power Association.(Netterville, Alicia)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. East Mississippi Electric Power Association answer due 7/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/11/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by East Mississippi Electric Power Association (Morgan, Mary)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to East Mississippi Electric Power Association. (cwl) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/10/2019) (cwl).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against East Mississippi Electric Power Association. Filing Fee - Waived, filed by William Paul Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl) Modified on 5/10/2019 (cwl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. East Mississippi Electric Power Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Mississippi Electric Power Association
Represented By: Alicia N. Netterville
Represented By: Mary Clay W. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Paul Smith
Represented By: Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?