BankUnited, N.A. v. D & D Environmental, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BankUnited, N.A.
Defendant: Marcus B. Daniels, D & D Environmental, Inc., Maxx Holdings, Inc., Marc B. Daniels, Sandra W. Daniels and Testing Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00341
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marcus B. Daniels, Sandra W. Daniels, Maxx Holdings, Inc., Testing Services, Inc..(Geno, Craig)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer. The Court sets a deadline of July 3, 2019, for Defendants Marcus Daniels, Sandra Daniels, Testing Services, Inc., and Maxx Holdings, Inc. to answer or otherwise file a responsive pleading. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/20/19 (RBM)
June 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sandra W. Daniels answer due 6/13/2019. (LAT)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Answer to Complaint Deadline Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Marcus B. Daniels, Sandra W. Daniels, Maxx Holdings, Inc., Testing Services, Inc. (Geno, Craig)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BankUnited, N.A.. Sandra W. Daniels served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Wilson, Andrew) Modified on 6/14/2019 (LAT).
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BankUnited, N.A.. Testing Services, Inc. served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Wilson, Andrew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BankUnited, N.A.. Maxx Holdings, Inc. served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Wilson, Andrew)
May 30, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 and #9 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It will be correctly refiled. (LAT)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. SUMMONS Returned Executed by BankUnited, N.A.. (Wilson, Andrew) Modified on 5/30/2019 (LAT).
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BankUnited, N.A.. Marcus B. Daniels served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Wilson, Andrew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. SUMMONS Returned Executed by BankUnited, N.A.. Maxx Holdings, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Wilson, Andrew) Modified on 5/30/2019 (LAT).
May 29, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 , #5 and #6 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (LAT)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.SUMMONS Returned Executed by BankUnited, N.A.. Testing Services, Inc. served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Wilson, Andrew) Modified on 5/29/2019 (LAT).
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. SUMMONS Returned Executed by BankUnited, N.A.. Maxx Holdings, Inc. served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Wilson, Andrew) Modified on 5/29/2019 (LAT).
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. SUMMONS Returned Executed by BankUnited, N.A.. Marcus B. Daniels served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Wilson, Andrew) Modified on 5/29/2019 (LAT).
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to D & D Environmental, Inc., Marcus B. Daniels, Sandra W. Daniels, Maxx Holdings, Inc., Testing Services, Inc.. (LAT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BankUnited, N.A. (Wilson, Andrew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Money Judgment against D & D Environmental, Inc., Marcus B. Daniels, Sandra W. Daniels, Maxx Holdings, Inc., Testing Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3990482), filed by BankUnited, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Loan No. 50-08, #2 Exhibit B- Loan No. 50-09, #3 Exhibit C- Guarantees, #4 Exhibit D- Loan Mod Agreement, #5 Exhibit E- Agreement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BankUnited, N.A. v. D & D Environmental, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus B. Daniels
Represented By: Craig M. Geno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & D Environmental, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxx Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Craig M. Geno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc B. Daniels
Represented By: Craig M. Geno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra W. Daniels
Represented By: Craig M. Geno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Testing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Craig M. Geno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BankUnited, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?