Hopkins-Archie et al v. The Travelers Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Niya Hopkins-Archie and David Archie
Defendant: Hub International Gulf South, The Travelers Insurance Company and Barbara Brown
Case Number: 3:2019cv00351
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #16 Response to #9 Order by Barbara Brown (Barfield, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by The Travelers Insurance Company (Russell, Dale)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by The Travelers Insurance Company (Russell, Dale)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by The Travelers Insurance Company (Russell, Dale)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Response to Order re #9 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/24/2019. (SR) filed by David Archie, Niya Hopkins-Archie (MGB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 Response in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by David Archie, Niya Hopkins-Archie filed by Barbara Brown (Barfield, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barbara Brown (Barfield, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Barbara Brown (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint)(Barfield, David)
June 25, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12 : MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT should be linked to MOTION to Remand. All related filings to motions (using the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order")should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made thecorrection. (LAT)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, and Plaintiff's Written Objection (ECF #4), re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by The Travelers Insurance Company (Smith, Blake) Modified on 6/25/2019 (LAT).
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand and Plaintiff's Written Objection (ECF #4) filed by The Travelers Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Business Information, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Ann B Mulcahy, #4 Exhibit 4 - Business Inquiry, #5 Exhibit 5 - Homeowner's Policy, #6 Exhibit 6 - Traveler's Notice of Removal to USDC)(Smith, Blake)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT re #6 State Court Record Answer Exhibit 1 - Policy by The Travelers Insurance Company (Smith, Blake)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/24/2019. (SR)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by David Archie, Niya Hopkins-Archie. (LAT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by David Archie, Niya Hopkins-Archie. (LAT)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 State Court Record by Defendant The Travelers Insurance Company Volumes One (Smith, Blake)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Barfield on behalf of Barbara Brown (Barfield, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Response in Opposition re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Insurance Company from Hinds County Court, MS, case number 19-910. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643054947) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Homeowners Policy Declarations, # 2 Exhibit 2- Denial Letter Apr. 15, 2016, # 3 Exhibit 3- State Court Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 4- Notice of Service of Process, # 5 Exhibit 5- State Court Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 6- Ann B. Mulcahy Affidavit, # 7 Exhibit 7- HUB Business Details, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) filed by David Archie, Niya Hopkins-Archie (LAT)
June 13, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : Incorrectly filed in the wrong case. Court staff has made the necessary changes. (LAT)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. Letter from Steven Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (LAT) Modified on 6/13/2019 (LAT).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale G. Russell on behalf of The Travelers Insurance Company (Russell, Dale)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Insurance Company from Hinds County Court, MS, case number 19-910. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643054947) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Homeowners Policy Declarations, #2 Exhibit 2- Denial Letter Apr. 15, 2016, #3 Exhibit 3- State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4- Notice of Service of Process, #5 Exhibit 5- State Court Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6- Ann B. Mulcahy Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 7- HUB Business Details, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins-Archie et al v. The Travelers Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niya Hopkins-Archie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Archie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hub International Gulf South
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: Blake D. Smith
Represented By: Dale G. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Brown
Represented By: David A. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?