Mills v. The UPS Store, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alysson Mills
Defendant: Chandler Westover, Courtney Herring, Austin Elsen, The UPS Store, Inc., Diane Lofton, Tammie Elsen, Herring Ventures, LLC, Jeannie Chisholm, Tammy Vinson and Rawlings & MacInnis, PA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00364
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The UPS Store, Inc. (Merritt, LaToya)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica T. Pulliam on behalf of The UPS Store, Inc. (Pulliam, Jessica)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Reuben V. Anderson on behalf of The UPS Store, Inc. (Anderson, Reuben)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of TIme to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by The UPS Store, Inc. (Merritt, LaToya)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. The UPS Store, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Bass, Lilli)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kincses Lindsay on behalf of Jeannie Chisholm, Rawlings & MacInnis, PA, Tammy Vinson (Lindsay, Emily)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Todd Burwell on behalf of Jeannie Chisholm, Rawlings & MacInnis, PA, Tammy Vinson (Burwell, G.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Tammy Vinson. (ND)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Austin Elsen answer due 8/25/2019; Tammie Elsen answer due 8/25/2019; Courtney Herring answer due 8/25/2019; Herring Ventures, LLC answer due 8/25/2019; Diane Lofton answer due 8/25/2019; Chandler Westover answer due 8/25/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/27/19 (RBM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Reissued as to Jeannie Chisholm, Austin Elsen, Tammie Elsen, Courtney Herring, Herring Ventures, LLC, Diane Lofton, Rawlings & MacInnis, PA, The UPS Store, Inc. and Chandler Westover in re #14 Amended Complaint. (ND)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Austin Elsen, Tammie Elsen, Courtney Herring, Herring Ventures, LLC, Diane Lofton, Chandler Westover (Guice, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alysson Mills.(Amond - PHV, Kristen)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Kristen D. Amond, Brent B. Barriere, Jason W. Burge and Rebekka C. Veith be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/10/2019. (JEJ)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. The UPS Store, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Bass, Lilli)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Courtney Herring served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Bass, Lilli)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Herring Ventures, LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Bass, Lilli)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Chandler Westover served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Bass, Lilli)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Diane Lofton served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Bass, Lilli)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Tammie Elsen served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Bass, Lilli)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Austin Elsen served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Bass, Lilli)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Austin Elsen, Tammie Elsen, Courtney Herring, Herring Ventures, LLC, Diane Lofton, The UPS Store, Inc., Chandler Westover. (KNS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Rebekka C. Veith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alysson Mills (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Order Waiving Fee)(Bass, Lilli)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Jason W. Burge to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alysson Mills (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Order Waiving Fee)(Bass, Lilli)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Brent B. Barriere to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alysson Mills (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Order Waiving Fee)(Bass, Lilli)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Kristen D. Amond to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alysson Mills (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Order Waiving Fee)(Bass, Lilli)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Austin Elsen, Tammie Elsen, Courtney Herring, Herring Ventures, LLC, Diane Lofton, The UPS Store, Inc. and Chandler Westover ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-3996639) filed by Alysson Mills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fake Timber Deeds, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Relatedness)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. The UPS Store, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler Westover
Represented By: William Lee Guice, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Herring
Represented By: William Lee Guice, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Elsen
Represented By: William Lee Guice, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The UPS Store, Inc.
Represented By: Reuben V. Anderson
Represented By: Jessica T. Pulliam
Represented By: LaToya C. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Lofton
Represented By: William Lee Guice, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammie Elsen
Represented By: William Lee Guice, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herring Ventures, LLC
Represented By: William Lee Guice, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Chisholm
Represented By: G. Todd Burwell
Represented By: Emily Kincses Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Vinson
Represented By: G. Todd Burwell
Represented By: Emily Kincses Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rawlings & MacInnis, PA
Represented By: G. Todd Burwell
Represented By: Emily Kincses Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alysson Mills
Represented By: Alysson Leigh Mills
Represented By: Lilli Evans Bass
Represented By: Kristen D. Amond - PHV
Represented By: Jason W. Burge - PHV
Represented By: Brent B. Barriere - PHV
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?