Phillips v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Marshall Phillips
Defendant: Dorthy Johnson and Pelicia Hall
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00384
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Remark: change of address per envelope for #9 Notice to: Unit 30 A Bldg., Parchman, MS 38738 (KNS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE "an Acknowledgment of PLRA" by Marshall Phillips re #3 Order Opsp2. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Response to Order re #7 filed by Marshall Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Plaintiff shall have until July 22, 2019 to comply with the previous Order #3 . Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 07/08/2019. [Copy of Order and Order #3 mailed to Plaintiff's new address of record] (CS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Marshall Phillips. New Address: C.M.C.F., PO Box 88550, Pearl, MS 39288. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #3 Order Opsp2,,. Mail sent to Marshall Phillips (MGB)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #1 Complaint. Mail sent to Marshall Phillips (MGB)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 05/31/2019. (CS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Marshall Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pelicia Hall, Dorthy Johnson, filed by Marshall Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope, #4 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copies of NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorthy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?