McQueen v. McNeil et al
Plaintiff: William Grady McQueen
Defendant: Timothy McNeil, Pro Se Department, John Does 1-4 and Steve Pickett
Case Number: 3:2019cv00389
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order.; *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/1/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff and Pearl River County Jail] (LDR)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (VM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by William Grady McQueen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in re #4 Order by William Grady McQueen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by William Grady McQueen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, on or before July 5, 2019, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/4/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/4/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Grady McQueen. (VM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy McNeil, Steve Pickett, John Does 1-4,, filed by William Grady McQueen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueen v. McNeil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grady McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?