Ekobena v. Rivers
Plaintiff: Stefan Ekobena
Defendant: Unknown Rivers
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00392
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text-only ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Unknown Rivers answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/1/19. (No further written order will be issued.) (Copy mailed to Petitioner.) (dfk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Unknown Rivers (Perez-Federal Gov, Marc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt as to Attorney General on 6/14/2019 in re #3 Order. (ND)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt as to Warden, FCC- Yazoo on 6/10/2019 in re #3 Order. (ND)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt as to Civil Process Clerk on 6/10/2019 in re #3 Order. (ND)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Respondent shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 06/06/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
June 4, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34643055095. (KNS)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Stefan Ekobena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's appeal, #2 Exhibit B - copy of Disciplinary Hearing Officer Report, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Truview Phone Number Center Report, #5 Exhibit E - Allynn Dietrich statement, #6 Exhibit F - FBOP Inmate Locator, #7 Exhibit G - FBOP Part 1 - Incident Report, #8 Envelope)(KNS)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Stefan Ekobena. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (Copies of NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ekobena v. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rivers
Represented By: Marc A. Perez-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Ekobena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?