Rayner v. Forest River Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alfred (Dwyane) Rayner
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Forest River Inc. and The Johnson Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00400
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 8/6/2019; Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 2/6/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2019; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 8/24/2019; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 11/6/2019; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 12/6/2019; Motions due by 2/20/2020; Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2019 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson; ADR Report due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/24/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
July 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 7/24/2019. Catouche Body and Andrew Harris, participated. A Case Management Order will be entered. (Lewis, Nijah)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff is granted to and including July 15, 2019 to file any applicable Motions pursuant to Rule 12 of theFederal Rules of Procedure. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/1/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Alfred (Dwyane) Rayner (Body, Catouche)
June 9, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Forest River Inc. from Rankin County Circuit Court, case number 61CI1:19-cv-95-a. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4007328) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayner v. Forest River Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Johnson Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred (Dwyane) Rayner
Represented By: Catouche J. L. Body
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?