Green Hills Development Company, LLC et al v. Oppenheimer Funds, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Green Hills Development Company, LLC and Dell Group Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Stonebridge Holdings III, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings II, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings I, LLC, Oppenheimer Funds, Inc. and UMB Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00416
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oppenheimer Funds, Inc., Stonebridge Holdings I, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings II, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings III, LLC, UMB Bank, N.A. (Fortenberry, Jason)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Green Hills Development Company, LLC (Heilman, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dell Group Holdings, LLC, Green Hills Development Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stonebridge/Green Hills Agreement)(Heilman, Michael)
July 19, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response shall be filed on or before July 24, 2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on July 19, 2019. (DI)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Dell Group Holdings, LLC, Green Hills Development Company, LLC (Heilman, Michael)
July 5, 2019 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Response is due by 7/19/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on 7/5/2019. (JB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Dell Group Holdings, LLC, Green Hills Development Company, LLC (Heilman, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Exhibit 2 by Oppenheimer Funds, Inc., Stonebridge Holdings I, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings II, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings III, LLC, UMB Bank, N.A. (Fortenberry, Jason)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oppenheimer Funds, Inc., Stonebridge Holdings I, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings II, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings III, LLC, UMB Bank, N.A. (Fortenberry, Jason)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Oppenheimer Funds, Inc., Stonebridge Holdings I, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings II, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings III, LLC, UMB Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Order and Petition from Trust Instruction Proceedings, #3 Exhibit Letter from Mississippi Supreme Court)(Fortenberry, Jason)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stonebridge Holdings I, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings II, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings III, LLC, UMB Bank, N.A. (Fortenberry, Jason)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oppenheimer Funds, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oppenheimer Acquisition Corporation for Oppenheimer Funds, Inc.. (Fortenberry, Jason)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oppenheimer Funds, Inc., Stonebridge Holdings I, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings II, LLC, Stonebridge Holdings III, LLC, UMB Bank, N.A. from Hinds County Circuit Court, case number 19-309. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4012769) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Hills Development Company, LLC et al v. Oppenheimer Funds, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonebridge Holdings III, LLC
Represented By: Jason Eric Fortenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonebridge Holdings II, LLC
Represented By: Jason Eric Fortenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonebridge Holdings I, LLC
Represented By: Jason Eric Fortenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer Funds, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Eric Fortenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jason Eric Fortenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Hills Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dell Group Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?