United States of America et al v. The City of Meridian, Mississippi
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi and United States of America
Defendant: The City of Meridian, Mississippi
Case Number: 3:2019cv00427
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/5/2019 (VM)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion Enter Consent Decree. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on August 5, 2019. (SP)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 Unopposed MOTION Enter Consent Decree filed by State of Mississippi, United States of America (Johnson-Federal Gov, Kristi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION Enter Consent Decree by State of Mississippi, United States of America (Johnson-Federal Gov, Kristi)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE (AMENDED) of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by State of Mississippi, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Consent Decree, #2 Appendix A: Early Action Capital Improvement Project, #3 Appendix B: EPA Region 4 Guidance)(Johnson-Federal Gov, Kristi)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by State of Mississippi, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Consent Decree)(Johnson-Federal Gov, Kristi)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of Meridian, Mississippi, filed by United States of America, State of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. The City of Meridian, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Gretchen L. Zmitrovich-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kristi H. Johnson-Federal Gov
Represented By: William A. Weinischke-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Meridian, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?