Gillum et al v. Ariellas NY Delicatessen, LLC
Plaintiff: Markesha Wells and Thomas Gillum
Defendant: Ariellas NY Delicatessen, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00431
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas Gillum, Markesha Wells. Ariellas NY Delicatessen, LLC waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Espy, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ariellas NY Delicatessen, LLC. (LAT)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ariellas NY Delicatessen, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4017813), filed by Thomas Gillum, Markesha Wells. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillum et al v. Ariellas NY Delicatessen, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markesha Wells
Represented By: Christopher William Espy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gillum
Represented By: Christopher William Espy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariellas NY Delicatessen, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?