Culver v. Warden
Plaintiff: Brian S. Culver
Defendant: Warden
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00434
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed by Warden - date of delivery left blank. (KNS)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Respondent shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/13/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
June 26, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34643055365 (KNS) (copy of NEF mailed to Plaintiff)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before July 26, 2019, Petitioner shall complete and file the attached application OR pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 06/26/2019. [Copy of Order and application mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Brian S. Culver. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KNS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Brian S. Culver. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copies of NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culver v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian S. Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?