AMCREF Fund 33, LLC v. Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc.

Plaintiff: AMCREF Fund 33, LLC
Defendant: Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00438
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 FINAL AGREED JUDGMENT OF REPLEVIN. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 08/14/19 (KNS)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re #1 Complaint, by AMCREF Fund 33, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Spencer, Jimmy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMCREF Fund 33, LLC. Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Spencer, Jimmy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMCREF Fund 33, LLC (Spencer, Jimmy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmy Fred Spencer, Jr on behalf of AMCREF Fund 33, LLC (Spencer, Jimmy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc.. (KNS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN against Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4018934), filed by AMCREF Fund 33, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Loan and Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Promissory Note A, #3 Exhibit 3 - Promissory Note B, #4 Exhibit 4 - Promissory Note C, #5 Exhibit 5 - UCC -1 Financing Statements, #6 Exhibit 6 - Default Notice, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) Modified on 6/21/2019 (KNS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMCREF Fund 33, LLC v. Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMCREF Fund 33, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie M. Rippee
Represented By: Jimmy Fred Spencer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?