Stuart C. Irby Company v. Longhorn Lighting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stuart C. Irby Company
Defendant: A. Wayne Huntsinger, Sports Fields, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company and Longhorn Lighting, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00439
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company answer due 8/27/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/8/19 (RBM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sports Fields, Inc. answer due 8/27/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/8/19 (RBM)
August 6, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (VM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Michel, Carol)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sports Fields, Inc. (Mallette, Pope)
July 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (VM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stuart C. Irby Company. Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Kimball, Brian)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stuart C. Irby Company. Sports Fields, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Kimball, Brian)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, A. Wayne Huntsinger, Longhorn Lighting, LLC, Sports Fields, Inc. (KNS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, A. Wayne Huntsinger, Longhorn Lighting, LLC, Sports Fields, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4019125), filed by Stuart C. Irby Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Credit Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 Invoices, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 Invoices, #4 Exhibit 3 - Terms and Conditions of Sale, #5 Exhibit 4 - Longhorn Invoice Summary, #6 Exhibit 5 - Payment Bond, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuart C. Irby Company v. Longhorn Lighting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Wayne Huntsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sports Fields, Inc.
Represented By: Pope S. Mallette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carol P. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longhorn Lighting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart C. Irby Company
Represented By: Brian Craig Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?