Wilson v. White et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Wilson
Defendant: Unknown Gamble, Trinity Food Services, Bert Unknown, Unknown White and Centurion of Mississippi
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00441
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer "Unknown" White Kitchen Supervisor on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer "Unknown" Gamble - Kitchen Supervisor on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer Bert "Unknown"- Kitchen Supervisor on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Trinity Food Services on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendants. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/19/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Unknown White Kitchen Supervisor, #2 Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Unknown Gamble Kitchen Supervisor, #3 Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Bert Unknown Kitchen Supervisor, #4 Notice of Lawsuit-Trinity Food Services, #5 Waiver of Service) (CS)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, the Court will construe Plaintiff's request to "remove" Centurion of Mississippi as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Centurion of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/19/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Response to Order re #6 ORDER, on or before August 9, 2019, Plaintiff must file a written response to specifically state how Defendant Centurion of Mississippi violated Plaintiff's constitutional rights, including dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) filed by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, on or before August 9, 2019, Plaintiff must file a written response to specifically state how Defendant Centurion of Mississippi violated Plaintiff's constitutional rights, including dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link] (CS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 06/25/2019. (CS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centurion of Mississippi, Unknown Gamble, Trinity Food Services, Bert Unknown, Unknown White, filed by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Tyrone Wilson,#202311,East MS Correctional Facility,4A-103,10641 Hwy 80 West,Meridian, MS 39307.) (LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Food Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?