Brown v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Issac Brown
Defendant: Steve Olander and Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00456
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss; terminating #8 Motion to Withdraw; finding as moot #9 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The parties informed the Court that they agree that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, properly filed under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1), is the operative pleading and that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is therefore moot. The parties agreed that all other pending motions should also be terminated as moot as a result. Finally, the parties agreed that Defendant shall have an additional 14 days within which to respond to the Amended Complaint, and that extension is hereby granted. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on August 23, 2019. (DI)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Issac Brown (Hazzard, Brent)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Issac Brown (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Bradley, Emily)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw #7 Amended Complaint by Issac Brown (Bradley, Emily)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steve Olander, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., filed by Issac Brown.(Bradley, Emily)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Graham Hall on behalf of Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Hall, Jennifer)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Lollar, Blythe)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Lollar, Blythe)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Mississippi Department of Employment Security. (Lollar, Blythe)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Steve Olander, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (PKM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, WITH JURY DEMAND, against Steve Olander, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0528-4024579), filed by Issac Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Olander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Graham Hall
Represented By: Blythe K. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac Brown
Represented By: Brent Hazzard
Represented By: Emily C. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?