Gambill v. YRC, Inc.
Plaintiff: William S. Gambill
Defendant: YRC, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00470
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by YRC, Inc..(Hodges, Melissa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by YRC, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. YRC, Inc. answer due 7/23/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/10/19 (RBM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by YRC, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by YRC, Inc. from Hinds County Circuit Court, case number 19-363. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4028340) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hinds County Circuit Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Lower Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Hinds County Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Hinds County Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gambill v. YRC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Gambill
Represented By: Robert Nicholas Norris
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?