Henry v. Rush Medical Group, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Felecia Henry
Defendant: Jane Does A-G, Lon Alexander, Rush Medical Group, P.A., John Does A-G and Rush Health Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00475
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Rush Health Systems, Inc., Rush Medical Group, P.A. (May, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Rush Health Systems, Inc., Rush Medical Group, P.A. (May, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rush Health Systems, Inc., Rush Medical Group, P.A..(May, William)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Howell, III on behalf of Lon Alexander (Howell, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENSES and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lon Alexander.(Johnson, Walter)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Rush Health Systems, Inc. answer due 8/11/2019; Rush Medical Group, P.A. answer due 8/11/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/1/19 (RBM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Richard Barry on behalf of Rush Health Systems, Inc., Rush Medical Group, P.A. (Barry, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rush Health Systems, Inc., Rush Medical Group, P.A. (May, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William T. May on behalf of Rush Health Systems, Inc., Rush Medical Group, P.A. (May, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felecia Henry. Rush Health Systems, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Neely, Walter)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felecia Henry. Rush Medical Group, P.A. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Neely, Walter)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lon Alexander, Rush Health Systems, Inc., Rush Medical Group, P.A. (PKM)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lon Alexander, Jane Does A-G, John Does A-G, Rush Health Systems, Inc., Rush Medical Group, P.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643055476), filed by Felecia Henry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Consultation, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Letter with USPS Tracking Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Rush Medical Group, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does A-G
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lon Alexander
Represented By: Walter T. Johnson
Represented By: John B. Howell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Medical Group, P.A.
Represented By: John Richard Barry
Represented By: William T. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A-G
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John Richard Barry
Represented By: William T. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felecia Henry
Represented By: Wayne Eric Stracener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?