Parker v. Mahindra Motors of North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Malcolm Parker
Defendant: Mahindra USA, Inc., Dixie Tractor Sales & Services and Mahindra Motors of North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00476
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mahindra USA, Inc. (Kellems, W.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mahindra USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Formation for Old South Farms Supply, LLC, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of James Welborn, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Regina Miller, #4 Exhibit Warranty Issued by Mahindra USA, Inc., #5 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Receipt of Warranty, #6 Exhibit Copy of Sales Receipt)(Kellems, W.)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 8/23/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Issued by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 8/5/19 (LWE)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mahindra USA, Inc. (Kellems, W.)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/29/2019. (SR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Malcolm Parker (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Tullos, Raymond)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mahindra USA, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Mahindra & Mahindra, Ltd. for Mahindra USA, Inc.. (Kellems, W.)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mahindra USA, Inc. from Circuit Court of Smith County, Mississippi, case number 19-00116-1. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4029845) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Mahindra Motors of North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahindra USA, Inc.
Represented By: W. Brady Kellems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Tractor Sales & Services
Represented By: W. Brady Kellems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahindra Motors of North America, Inc.
Represented By: W. Brady Kellems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Parker
Represented By: Raymond P. Tullos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?