Peyton v. Mahindra Motors of North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Peyton
Defendant: Mahindra USA, Inc., Mahindra Motors of North America, Inc. and Dixie Tractor Sales & Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv00477
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mahindra USA, Inc. (Kellems, W.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mahindra USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Formation for Old South Farms Supply, LLC, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of James Welborn, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Regina Miller, #4 Exhibit Warranty Issued by Mahindra USA, Inc., #5 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Receipt of Warranty, #6 Exhibit Copy of Sales Receipt)(Kellems, W.)
August 15, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Defendant's response shall be filed on or before August 23, 2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on August 15, 2019. (DI)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mahindra USA, Inc. (Kellems, W.)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #5 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/6/2019. (JEJ)
August 2, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall have an additional fourteen days to respond to Plaintiff's motion to remand. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on August 2, 2019. (DI)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mahindra USA, Inc. (Kellems, W.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Eddie Peyton (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Tullos, Raymond)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mahindra USA, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Mahindra & Mahindra, Ltd. for Mahindra USA, Inc.. (Kellems, W.)
July 25, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Motion to Remand to State Court. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event, Motion to Remand to State Court. (VM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. ANSWER to Complaint by Eddie Peyton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Tullos, Raymond) Modified on 7/25/2019 (VM).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Mahindra USA, Inc. (Kellems, W.)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mahindra USA, Inc. from Circuit Court of Smith County, Mississippi, case number 19-115-2. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4029921) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peyton v. Mahindra Motors of North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahindra USA, Inc.
Represented By: W. Brady Kellems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahindra Motors of North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Tractor Sales & Services
Represented By: W. Brady Kellems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Peyton
Represented By: Raymond P. Tullos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?