McLin v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Nicholas McLin
Defendant: Anderson Johnson
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00479
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Tom S Lee
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Anderson Johnson, through Jim Hood, served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (VM)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Respondent Johnson, through Jim Hood, shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service upon the said Jim Hood of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/20/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Response to Order re #5 ORDER, filed by Nicholas McLin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hinds Co Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hinds Co Order, #3 Envelope)(VM)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, on or before August 26, 2019, Petitioner shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/5/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/5/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in re #2 Order, by Nicholas McLin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, on or before August 16, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/17/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nicholas McLin. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Material, #2 Envelope 1, #3 Envelope 2, #4 Notice of Assignment)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLin v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Johnson
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas McLin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?