Davis v. Wright International Student Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammy Davis
Defendant: Wright International Student Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00488
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wright International Student Services, Inc. Answer due 9/13/2019. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/27/2019. (ACF)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Wright International Student Services, Inc. (Gregory, Samuel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel D. Gregory on behalf of Wright International Student Services, Inc. (Gregory, Samuel)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting unopposed #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/1/2019. (ACF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Wright International Student Services, Inc. (Pedigo, Scott)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy Davis. Wright International Student Services, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Kersey - PHV, Joshua)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joshua B. Kersey is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff, Tammy Davis and in association with local counsel and upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/15/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
July 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 . Attorney is directed to fill in the case number on all future pleadings. (ND)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Joshua R. Kersey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4034400) by Tammy Davis (Wilkins, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wright International Student Services, Inc.. (ND)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wright International Student Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 34643055581), filed by Tammy Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Wright International Student Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright International Student Services, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel D. Gregory
Represented By: Scott W. Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Davis
Represented By: Robert F. Wilkins
Represented By: Joshua R.. Kersey - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?