Mitchell v. McGee et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Mitchell
Defendant: East Mississippi Correctional Facility, CO Unknown Lawson, CO Unknown McGee and CO Unknown Robinson
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00494
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Brandon Mitchell shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than September 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/27/2019. [Copy of Order mailed Plaintiff] (CS)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #3 , #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/27/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Premier SupplyLink] (CS)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #4 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Brandon Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in response to #5 ORDER by Brandon Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/17/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/17/2019. (CS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Brandon Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against East Mississippi Correctional Facility, Unknown Lawson, Unknown McGee, Unknown Robinson, filed by Brandon Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copies of NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)
July 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 : Wrong event chosen. Complaint correctly refiled as Doc. 2. (KNS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***COUNTERCLAIM against East Mississippi Correctional Facility, Unknown Lawson, Unknown McGee, Unknown Robinson, filed by Brandon Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copies of NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff) Modified on 7/16/2019 (KNS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. McGee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Mississippi Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Unknown Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Unknown McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Unknown Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?