Walton v. Carnival Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Walton
Defendant: Carnival Corporation and John/Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2019cv00561
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Confirmation of case transferred and opened in the Southern District of Florida as case 1:19-cv-23886, filed 09/18/2019. (LAT)
September 17, 2019 Transfer order emailed to IT Department for electronic transfer of case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division. Clerk will docket confirmation of receipt and new case number when received from the Southern District of Florida, Miami. (LAT)
September 17, 2019 District Transfer Out to the District of Southern District of Florida, Miami Division. (LAT)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Motion to Change Venue. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/17/2019. (AD)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER regarding #5 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. On August 19, 2019, Defendant filed a Motion to Transfer Venue. Plaintiff's response is now overdue. On its own motion, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff an extension. Plaintiff shall file her response on or before September 16, 2019. If Plaintiff does not file a response by this deadline, the Court may rule on Defendant's motion without the benefit of Plaintiff's arguments. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/6/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AD)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTED TEXT ONLY ORDER: CMC was scheduled on 10/1/2019; now cancelled. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/6/2019. (ACF)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER staying proceedings and cancelling case management conference now scheduled on 9/30/2019 at 9:30 a.m. until a ruling is entered on Motion to Transfer. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/6/2019. (ACF)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint for Damages by Carnival Corporation.(Stone, Adam)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Change Venue Transfer filed by Carnival Corporation (Stone, Adam)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue Transfer by Carnival Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cruise Ticket Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Cruise Details, #3 Exhibit C - Cruise Ticket Contract Acceptance Form, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Suzanne Vazquez)(Stone, Adam)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaytie M. Pickett on behalf of Carnival Corporation (Pickett, Kaytie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackie R. Bost, II on behalf of Carnival Corporation (Bost, Jackie)
August 14, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16(a) Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Carnival Corporation from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 19-488. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4058333) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- McFarland Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- McFarland Final Judgment, #4 Exhibit D- McFarland Jury Report, #5 Exhibit E- Kirkland Complaint, #6 Exhibit F- Kirkland Jury Report, #7 Exhibit G- Kirkland Final Judgment, #8 Exhibit H- Good man Complaint, #9 Exhibit I- Goodman Jury Report, #10 Exhibit J- Goodman Judgment, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Carnival Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Walton
Represented By: Ali Muhammad ShamsidDeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Adam Stone
Represented By: Kaytie M. Pickett
Represented By: Jackie R. Bost, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?