Butler v. Lincoln County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Butler
Defendant: Lincoln County, Mississippi and C. E. (Eddie) Brown
Case Number: 3:2019cv00564
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Intradistrict Transfer to Western Division, 5:19-cv-94. (KNS)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Change Venue. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer the above styled and numbered cause to the Western Division of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 09/25/19 (KNS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Change Venue by C. E. (Eddie) Brown, Lincoln County, Mississippi (Allen, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by C. E. (Eddie) Brown, Lincoln County, Mississippi.(Allen, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to C. E. (Eddie) Brown, Lincoln County, Mississippi. (KNS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C. E. (Eddie) Brown, Lincoln County, Mississippi ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4059537), filed by Jesse Butler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Lincoln County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Butler
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln County, Mississippi
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. E. (Eddie) Brown
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?