Krause v. University of Mississippi Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Denise D. Krause
Defendant: John Does 1-5 and University of Mississippi Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00571
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due up through and including October 31, 2019, NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/20/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by University of Mississippi Medical Center (Taylor, Robin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denise D. Krause. University of Mississippi Medical Center served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Bass, Lilli)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to University of Mississippi Medical Center. (LAT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against John Does 1-5, University of Mississippi Medical Center ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4061922), filed by Denise D. Krause. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krause v. University of Mississippi Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Mississippi Medical Center
Represented By: Robin Banck Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise D. Krause
Represented By: Lilli Evans Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?