Scott v. Mason
Plaintiff: Tarrick Scott
Defendant: Victor Mason
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00582
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, if Petitioner would like his pleadings #4 , #6 to remain filed, he is directed to place his signature on the documents and return them to the Court no later than October 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/10/2019. [Copy of Order, Response #4 and Notice #6 mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Tarrick Scott. New Address: 5128 Ridgewood Road, Jackson, MS 39211. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, if Petitioner would like his #4 Response to remain filed, he is directed to place his signature on the document and return it to the Court no later than September 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 09/13/2019. [Copy of Order and a copy of Response #4 mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Response to #3 ORDER, filed by Tarrick Scott. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before September 16, 2019, Petitioner shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/26/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
August 23, 2019 Filing fee PAID: $ 5.00, receipt number 34643056117. (ND)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, on or before September 20, 2019, Petitioner shall complete and file the attached application OR pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/21/2019. [Copy of Order and application mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tarrick Scott. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarrick Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?