Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. v. Capitala Finance Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc.
Defendant: Capitala Finance Corp., Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP, John F. McGlinn, Capital South Partners Fund II, LP and Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00587
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Dismiss , #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(7), 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. (McCraney, W.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence Webster, III on behalf of Capital South Partners Fund II, LP, Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP, Capitala Finance Corp., John F. McGlinn (Webster, Clarence)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. re #12 Waiver of Service Executed, (McCraney, W.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(7), 12(b)(6) and 9(b) filed by Capital South Partners Fund II, LP, Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP, Capitala Finance Corp., John F. McGlinn (Blackwood, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(7), 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Capital South Partners Fund II, LP, Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP, Capitala Finance Corp., John F. McGlinn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from March 12, 2019 Bankruptcy Proceeding Trial Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - OSF Court's Opinion)(Blackwood, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP identifying Other Affiliate HMP III GP, LLC for Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP. (Robinson, Emerson)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP (Robinson, Emerson)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , MOTION to Dismiss by Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP (Robinson, Emerson)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Stockholders Agreement among On-Site Fuel Holdings, Inc. and CERTAIN STOCKHOLDERS OF THE COMPANY DESIGNATED HEREIN)(Robinson, Emerson)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc.. Capital South Partners Fund II, LP waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (McCraney, W.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc.. John F. McGlinn served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Noble, Douglas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc.. Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (McCraney, W.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc.. Capitala Finance Corp. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (McCraney, W.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Capital South Partners Fund II, LP, Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP. (VM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. as to Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP. (McCraney, W.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. as to Capital South Partners Fund II, LP. (McCraney, W.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mansfield Energy Corp. for Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc.. (McCraney, W.)
August 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Section 2.C. and FED.R.Civ.P.11 an attorney's password issued by the court combined with the user's identification (login) serves as the attorney's signature for Rule 11 and other purposes. Attorneys should not permit other attorneys to use their login and password for any ECF filing. Document #4 will be disregarded and the attorney with the electronic signature on the document should re-file document. (VM)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mansfield Energy Corp. for Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc.. (Noble, Douglas) Modified on 8/21/2019 (VM).
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Noble on behalf of Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. (Noble, Douglas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capitala Finance Corp., Capital South Partners Fund II, LP, Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP, John F. McGlinn, and Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP, (VM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capitala Finance Corp., Capital South Partners Fund II, LP, Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP, John F. McGlinn, and Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP, (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4065910), filed by Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Strategic Alliance and Acquisition Option Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2- Email dated May 1, 2018, #3 Exhibit 3- Tri-Party Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4- Email dated June 14, 2018, #5 Exhibit 5- Email dated June 15, 2018, #6 Exhibit 6- Email dated August 17, 2018, #7 Exhibit 7- Email dated August 20, 2018, #8 Exhibit 8- Email dated September 5, 2018, #9 Exhibit 9- On-Site Letter dated October 25, 2018, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc. v. Capitala Finance Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitala Finance Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Blackwood
Represented By: Clarence Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital South Partners SBIC Fund III, LP
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Blackwood
Represented By: Clarence Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. McGlinn
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Blackwood
Represented By: Clarence Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital South Partners Fund II, LP
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Blackwood
Represented By: Clarence Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbert Mezzanine Partners III SBIC, LP
Represented By: Emerson Barney Robinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansfield Oil Company of Gainesville, Inc.
Represented By: W. Thomas McCraney, III
Represented By: Douglas C. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?