Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Southern Stone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Southern Stone, LLC, Richard Earl, Anthony Duckworth and Preston Powell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00588
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Southern Stone, LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Getz, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Brian L. Yoakum be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/19/2019. (JEJ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Brian L. Yoakum to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4084245) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Getz, Joseph)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anthony Duckworth, Richard Earl, Preston Powell and Southern Stone, LLC. (ND)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Duckworth, Richard Earl, Preston Powell and Southern Stone, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4066193), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Southern Stone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Stone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph T. Getz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?