Smith et al v. Noxubee County, Mississippi
Plaintiff: Dontevis Smith, Eddie Franklin and Kenneth K. Stallings, Sr.
Defendant: Noxubee County, Mississippi
Case Number: 3:2019cv00633
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Noxubee County, Mississippi.(Huskison, Berkley)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Noxubee County, Mississippi answer due 10/10/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/25/2019. (dcw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or other responsive pleading) by Noxubee County, Mississippi (Huskison, Berkley)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dontevis Smith, Kenneth K. Stallings, Sr, Eddie Franklin. Noxubee County, Mississippi served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Ryan, William)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Noxubee County, Mississippi. (KNS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Noxubee County, Mississippi ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4079918), filed by Dontevis Smith, Kenneth K. Stallings, Sr, Eddie Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Noxubee County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontevis Smith
Represented By: William Benjamin Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Franklin
Represented By: William Benjamin Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth K. Stallings, Sr.
Represented By: William Benjamin Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noxubee County, Mississippi
Represented By: Berkley N. Huskison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?