Regions Bank v. Landrum
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Defendant: Thomas David Landrum
Case Number: 3:2019cv00635
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed Motion #5 for Extension of Time to Answer. Thomas David Landrum answer due 11/18/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/21/2019. (dcw)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Thomas David Landrum (Barnes, Harris)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regions Bank. Thomas David Landrum served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Bertas, Jean)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Cooper Bertas on behalf of Regions Bank (Bertas, Jean)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Thomas David Landrum. (MGB)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas David Landrum ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643056263), filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Forbearance Note, #2 Exhibit B - Forbearance Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Stock Pledge, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Default, #5 Exhibit E SCRA Single Record Request, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank v. Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: James N. Adams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas David Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?