Pendleton v. Gurganus et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Pendleton
Defendant: Brenda Gurganus, Essentia Insurance Company, ACCC Insurance Company, Enterprise Leasing Co.-South Central, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC, RIS Rental Insurance Service, Inc., John Does 1-6 and Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00696
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Jeffrey A. Soble admitted after payment remitted. The Clerk is directed to alter the docket to reflect his entry of appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/25/2019. (ACF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand filed by Tiffany Pendleton (Whitney, Clifford)
November 19, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Jeffery A. Soble to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4143226) by Enterprise Leasing Co.-South Central (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Green, Donna)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #32 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #23 MOTION to Remand. Reply due on or before 11/25/2019. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 11/15/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
November 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #32 : Clerk's office has created a relationship to Motion for Remand, document #23 . (PKM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand, document #23 , by Tiffany Pendleton (Whitney, Clifford) Modified on 11/15/2019 (PKM).
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 Rebuttal re #6 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC (Morgan, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #29 Response in Opposition to #23 Motion to Remand filed by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC (Morgan, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Remand filed by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC (Morgan, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company answer due 12/12/2019. Ordered that RIS Rental Insurance Service, Inc. is Dismissed from this lawsuit without Prejudice and Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company will be substituted in place of the previously named defendant, RIS Rental Insurance Service, Inc. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 11/12/19 (MGB)
November 12, 2019 Filing 27 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RIS Rental Insurance Service, Inc. (Ellzey, Scott)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The new deadline is November 12, 2019. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/30/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
October 30, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #25 : Clerk's office has created a relationship to Motion to Sever Claims, document #6 . (PKM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COUNTERCLAIMS by Tiffany Pendleton re #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaims of Defendant Essentia (Whitney, Clifford)
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response in Opposition to #6 , Motion to Sever Claims by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC (Morgan, Robert) Modified on 10/30/2019 (PKM).
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY AND CANCELLING CONFERENCE. The Telephonic Case Management Conference set for November 14, 2019 is hereby cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/29/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
October 29, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #18 : Incorrect document attached; Motion #18 has been termed. Document has been refile correctly as document #23 . Document #19 has been modified to show a relationship to Motion to Remand, document #23 . Document #21 Motion for Extension of Time has been modified to show a relationship to document #5 Answer, COUNTERCLAIM. (PKM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand by Tiffany Pendleton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Whitney, Clifford)
October 28, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Enterprise Leasing Co.-South Central (Green, Donna)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #5 Counterclaims of Defendant Essentia by Tiffany Pendleton (Whitney, Clifford) Modified on 10/29/2019 (PKM).
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Tiffany Pendleton (Whitney, Clifford)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Remand filed by Tiffany Pendleton (Whitney, Clifford) Modified on 10/29/2019 (PKM).
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. MOTION to Remand by Tiffany Pendleton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ltr fr Hagerty, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy)(Whitney, Clifford) Modified on 10/29/2019 (PKM).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Sever Claims. Responses due by 10/28/2019. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/15/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Sever Claims by Enterprise Leasing Co.-South Central (Green, Donna)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Sever #6 and the Counterclaim #5 . Responses due 10/28/2019. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/7/2019. (ACF)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer RIS Rental Insurance Service, Inc. answer due 11/12/2019. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/7/2019. (ACF)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enterprise Leasing Co.-South Central identifying Corporate Parent Enterprise Holdings, Inc. for Enterprise Leasing Co.-South Central. (Green, Donna)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 First NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Response to Request for Admissions by Brenda Gurganus (Rogers, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Harris on behalf of RIS Rental Insurance Service, Inc. (Harris, Adam)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Sever Claims, #5 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Tiffany Pendleton (Whitney, Clifford)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RIS Rental Insurance Service, Inc. (Ellzey, Scott)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC (Morgan, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Essentia Insurance Company (Morgan, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACCC Insurance Company (McNees, Edward)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC (Morgan, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Sever Claims by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint)(Morgan, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Tiffany Pendleton by Essentia Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Policy, #2 Exhibit B, Letter 12-19-2019, #3 Exhibit C, Letter 02-15-2019, #4 Exhibit D, Letter 02-21-2019, #5 Exhibit E, Letter 02-22-2019, #6 Exhibit F, Letter 03-21-2019, #7 Exhibit G, Letter 04-22-2019, #8 Exhibit H, Letter 05-16-2019, #9 Exhibit I, Letter 06-17-2019, #10 Exhibit J, Letter 08-06-2019)(Morgan, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC.(Morgan, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Consent to Removal by RIS Rental Insurance Service, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Ellzey, Scott)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Joinder in Document by ACCC Insurance Company to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC, Essentia Insurance Company (McNees, Edward)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Essentia Insurance Company, Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC from Warren County Circuit, MS, case number 19-118. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4101294) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #2 Exhibit A- Docket and Pleadings) (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendleton v. Gurganus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Gurganus
Represented By: James Scott Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentia Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Douglas Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCC Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward Russell McNees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Co.-South Central
Represented By: Donna Powe Green
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Soble - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hagerty Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Robert Douglas Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIS Rental Insurance Service, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Timothy Ellzey
Represented By: Adam B. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Pendleton
Represented By: R. E. Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Clifford C. Whitney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?