Lampley et al v. City of Jackson, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Rakasha Adams, Desmond Barney, Lincoln Lampley, Warren Hull, Anthony Fox, Roy Dickerson, Anthony Thompson, Michael Tarrio, Enike Smith, Darryl Robinson and Albert Taylor
Defendant: City of Jackson, Mississippi and Chief James Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00723
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Wilson White-City Gov on behalf of All Defendants (White-City Gov, Wendy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 James Davis' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by James Davis.(Jackson-Winters-City Gov, LaShundra)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 City of Jackson's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Jackson, Mississippi.(Jackson-Winters-City Gov, LaShundra)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Danks, Jr on behalf of Desmond Barney (Danks, Dale)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Dale Long on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Long, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Tarrio, Enike Smith, Anthony Fox, Roy Dickerson, Warren Hull, Anthony Thompson, Albert Taylor, Lincoln Lampley, Rakasha Adams, Darryl Robinson, Desmond Barney. James Davis served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Cory, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Verdier Cory, Jr on behalf of Rakasha Adams, Roy Dickerson, Anthony Fox, Warren Hull, Darryl Robinson (Cory, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Tarrio, Enike Smith, Anthony Fox, Roy Dickerson, Warren Hull, Anthony Thompson, Albert Taylor, Lincoln Lampley, Rakasha Adams, Darryl Robinson, Desmond Barney. City of Jackson, Mississippi served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Cory, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Jackson, Mississippi, James Davis. (MGB)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Jackson, Mississippi, James Davis ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643056777), filed by Michael Tarrio, Enike Smith, Anthony Fox, Roy Dickerson, Warren Hull, Anthony Thompson, Albert Taylor, Lincoln Lampley, Rakasha Adams, Darryl Robinson, Desmond Barney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lampley et al v. City of Jackson, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakasha Adams
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Represented By: Michael Verdier Cory, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Barney
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Represented By: Dale Danks, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Dale Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln Lampley
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Hull
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Represented By: Michael Verdier Cory, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Fox
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Represented By: Michael Verdier Cory, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Dickerson
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Represented By: Michael Verdier Cory, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Thompson
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tarrio
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enike Smith
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Represented By: Michael Dale Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Robinson
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Represented By: Michael Verdier Cory, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Taylor
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jackson, Mississippi
Represented By: LaShundra B. Jackson-Winters-City Gov
Represented By: Wendy Wilson White-City Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief James Davis
Represented By: LaShundra B. Jackson-Winters-City Gov
Represented By: Wendy Wilson White-City Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?