Smith v. Rivers
Plaintiff: Johnnell Smith, Sr.
Defendant: Warden C. Rivers
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00749
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. C. Rivers answer due 2/7/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 18, 2019 (King, Steve)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by C. Rivers (Mayer-Federal Gov, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden C. Rivers served on 12/13/2019. (PG)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Gregg Mayer-Federal Gov, Jr on behalf of C. Rivers (Mayer-Federal Gov, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to C. Rivers, Civil Process Clerk served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (VM)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Respondent Warden C. Rivers shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this case within 20 days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/11/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
December 6, 2019 Filing fee received: $5, receipt number 34643057530. (VM)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Written Explanation of Payment by Johnnell Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Request for Withdrawal of Inmate Funds, #2 Envelope)(VM)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. $5.00 filing fee due within 20 days, as set out herein. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 11/13/19 (NEF/order mailed to plaintiff at #20001-026, Yazoo City Federal Correctional Complex-Low, 2225 Haley Barbour Parkway, P.O. Box 5000, Yazoo City, MS 39194) (LWE)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re #2 Order by Johnnell Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(VM)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, on or before November 22, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/23/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Johnnell Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Documents, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnell Smith, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden C. Rivers
Represented By: Robert Gregg Mayer-Federal Gov, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?