Oliver v. Covidien Sales LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edgar (Ed) Oliver
Defendant: Does 1-10, Tyco Healthcare Group L.P., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00795
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Medtronic, Inc., Tyco Healthcare Group L.P. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edgar (Ed) Oliver (Sanders, Edward)
February 18, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Memorandum in Support. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event. (cwl)
February 17, 2020 Filing 11 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edgar (Ed) Oliver (Sanders, Edward) Modified on 2/18/2020 (cwl).
February 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edgar (Ed) Oliver (Sanders, Edward)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Medtronic, Inc., Tyco Healthcare Group L.P. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Medtronic, Inc., Tyco Healthcare Group L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Instructions for Use ("IFU") for the PCO-VP)(Abdalla, Mary Clift)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Medtronic, Inc., Tyco Healthcare Group L.P. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Ana C. Reyes be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the defendants in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/29/2020. (JEJ)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Ana C. Reyes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4183109) by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Medtronic, Inc., Tyco Healthcare Group L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Abdalla, Mary Clift)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Adrienne E. Van Winkle and Haley L. Wasserman be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the defendants in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/15/2020. (JEJ)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Haley L. Wasserman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4174103) by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Medtronic, Inc., Tyco Healthcare Group L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Abdalla, Mary Clift)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Adrienne E. Van Winkle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4174076) by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Medtronic, Inc., Tyco Healthcare Group L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Abdalla, Mary Clift)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed Motion #3 for Extension of Time to Answer. Covidien Holding, Inc. answer due 2/3/2020; Covidien LP answer due 2/3/2020; Covidien Sales LLC answer due 2/3/2020; Medtronic, Inc. answer due 2/3/2020; Tyco Healthcare Group L.P. answer due 2/3/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/2/2020. (dcw)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Medtronic, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Medtronic, Inc., Tyco Healthcare Group L.P.. (LAT)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LP, Covidien Sales LLC, Does 1-10, Medtronic, Inc., Tyco Healthcare Group L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4134407), filed by Edgar (Ed) Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Covidien Sales LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Healthcare Group L.P.
Represented By: Mary Clift Abdalla
Represented By: Haley L. Wasserman - PHV
Represented By: Ana C. Reyes - PHV
Represented By: Adrienne E. Van Winkle - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien LP
Represented By: Mary Clift Abdalla
Represented By: Haley L. Wasserman - PHV
Represented By: Ana C. Reyes - PHV
Represented By: Adrienne E. Van Winkle - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien Sales LLC
Represented By: Mary Clift Abdalla
Represented By: Haley L. Wasserman - PHV
Represented By: Ana C. Reyes - PHV
Represented By: Adrienne E. Van Winkle - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Clift Abdalla
Represented By: Haley L. Wasserman - PHV
Represented By: Ana C. Reyes - PHV
Represented By: Adrienne E. Van Winkle - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Clift Abdalla
Represented By: Haley L. Wasserman - PHV
Represented By: Ana C. Reyes - PHV
Represented By: Adrienne E. Van Winkle - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar (Ed) Oliver
Represented By: Edward L. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?