Rai v. Henderson
Appellee: Derek A. Henderson
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson
Appellant: Dr Pradeep Rai
Debtor: VCR, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00808
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot filed by Derek A. Henderson (Noble, Douglas)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot filed by Pradeep Rai (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript)(Moore, John)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* DOCUMENT Supplemental Clerk's Certificate (Attachments: #1 Attachment Restricted Designated Item, #2 Attachment Transmittal Letter).(PG)
December 26, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot. Response is due by 1/6/2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on December 26, 2019. No further written order will issue. (EHP)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot by Pradeep Rai (Moore, John)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Record for Bankruptcy by U. S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson (Attachments: #1 Item 1 Docket Sheet, #2 Item 2 Designated Items, #3 Item 3 Dkts 809, 811 & 820, #4 Transmittal Letter)(cwl)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot by Derek A. Henderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" (Judge Olack's Memorandum Opinion & Final Judgment), #2 Exhibit "2" (Special Warranty Deed), #3 Exhibit "3" (Closing Statement))(Noble, Douglas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 12-02009. File received The docketing of the record on appeal by USDC starts the briefing schedule. Attorneys should refer to Bankruptcy Rule 8018 for all briefing schedules., filed by Pradeep Rai. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's certificate, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Cover Sheet)(cwl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2019: #4 Notice of Appeal - (Dkt.# 809)) (cwl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rai v. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Derek A. Henderson
Represented By: Derek A. Henderson
Represented By: Douglas C. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dr Pradeep Rai
Represented By: John D. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: VCR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?