Capitol Indemnity Corporation v. Frison et al
Plaintiff: Capitol Indemnity Corporation
Defendant: Alex Terrell Johnson, Branford Frison, Royshandra Patrice Wilson and Brittany Gray
Case Number: 3:2019cv00816
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Alex Terrell Johnson, Brittany Gray, Royshandra Patrice Wilson by Alex Terrell Johnson, Brittany Gray, Royshandra Patrice Wilson.(Barrett, Jonathan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Royshandra Patrice Wilson served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Moran, Kyle)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants Gray and Johnson are allowed until January 10, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 1/2/2020 (Lewis, Nijah)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Brittany Gray, Alex Terrell Johnson (Barrett, Jonathan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Brittany Gray served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Moran, Kyle)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Alex Terrell Johnson served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Moran, Kyle)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Branford Frison, Brittany Gray, Alex Terrell Johnson, Royshandra Patrice Wilson. (cwl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Branford Frison, Brittany Gray, Alex Terrell Johnson, Royshandra Patrice Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4138205), filed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Underlying Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capitol Indemnity Corporation v. Frison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Terrell Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branford Frison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royshandra Patrice Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Gray
Represented By: Jonathan P. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Indemnity Corporation
Represented By: Kyle Stuart Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?