Murshid v. Robertson et al
Plaintiff: Abdulkhalia Murshid
Defendant: Department of Revenue, Carol, Ricky Robertson and Rickee Nelson
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00822
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 Response to #12 Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by Abdulkhalia Murshid. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 Letter from Abdulkhalia Murshid regarding address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ND)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Carol, Head of Department of Revenue on 12/30/2019. Waiver of Service due by 1/30/2020. (CS)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Rickee Nelson on 12/30/2019. Waiver of Service due by 1/30/2020. (CS)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue Notices of Lawsuit for Defendants Head of Department of Revenue Carol and Rickee Nelson. Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form or a Response, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/30/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit-Carol, #2 Notice of Lawsuit-Rickee Nelson, #3 Waiver of Service) (CS)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum Opinion and Order of Partial Dismissal Department of Revenue and Ricky Robertson dismissed with prejudice pursuant to judicial immunity. The remainder of this case shall proceed. Department of Revenue and Ricky Robertson terminated. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 12/30/19 (TRS)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Clerk shall add Rickee Nelson as a Defendant herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/27/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Abdulkhalia Murshid. New Address: M.D.O.C., P.O. Box 88550, Pearl, MS 39208. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Response to Order re #8 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than December 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/26/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) filed by Abdulkhalia Murshid (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MGB)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than December 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/26/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 , #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/26/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Sheriff Billy Sollie] (CS)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Abdulkhalia Murshid (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl)
November 25, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 Court staff replaced to reflect the file stamp on the document. (cwl)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Abdulkhalia Murshid. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/25/2019) (cwl).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/18/2019. (CS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Abdulkhalia Murshid. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carol, Department of Revenue, Ricky Robertson, filed by Abdulkhalia Murshid. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (Copies of NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murshid v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulkhalia Murshid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?