Stinner v. Southern Energy Homes, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda J. Stinner
Defendant: Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc., American Mobile Home Transport, LLC and Southern Energy Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00837
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Response is due on or before 1/14/2020.NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 1/7/2020 (CGC)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Brenda J. Stinner (Anderson, Paul)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for January 8, 2020 is hereby stayed. In the event that the Motion to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and Stay is denied, counsel shall contact the Court within ten (10) days of the filing of such order to schedule a telephonic case management conference herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/30/2019 (Lewis, Nijah)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 Joinder in Document by Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc. to #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Williams, Matthew)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Response to Order re TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to supplement state court record, as attached to notice of removal. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/26/2019. (ACF) filed by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC (Weems, M.)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to supplement state court record, as attached to notice of removal. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/26/2019. (ACF)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Joinder in Document by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC to #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Weems, M.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION Supplement Notice of Removal by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Answer and Defenses of American Mobile Home Transport, LLC)(Weems, M.)
December 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 : This document requests multiple motion reliefs. Each requested relief should be selected from the list of motion events. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (VM)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay , filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Quinn, James) MOTION to Stay Proceedings added on 12/18/2019 (VM).
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Brewer, #2 Exhibit A-1 BDRA, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of Gerald Mims, #4 Exhibit B-1 - Acknowledgment and Acceptance, #5 Exhibit C- Amended Complaint)(Quinn, James). Added MOTION to Stay Proceedings on 12/18/2019 (VM).
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Quinn, James)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by Southern Energy Homes, Inc..(Quinn, James)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment and Acceptance)(Williams, Matthew)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Moran Young on behalf of Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc. (Young, Jennifer)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Joinder in Document by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Weems, M.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. from County Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, case number CA19-1102(H). (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4142736) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings served on Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - County Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kathy Hayes, #4 Exhibit C-1 - Notice from AG, #5 Exhibit C-2 - Complaint Form, #6 Exhibit C-3 - Bill of Sale, #7 Exhibit C-4 - Purchase Agreement, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stinner v. Southern Energy Homes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Moran Young
Represented By: Matthew M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mobile Home Transport, LLC
Represented By: M. James Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Energy Homes, Inc.
Represented By: James L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda J. Stinner
Represented By: Helen Virginia Kramer
Represented By: Paul Manion Anderson
Represented By: Samuel S. McHard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?